LA SCR51 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Joan W. Burmaster on the occasion of her retirement from 45 years of service in healthcare and law.
Title
Commends Joan W. Burmaster on the occasion of her retirement from 45 years of service in healthcare and law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 51 ADOPT (#576) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |