LA SCR51 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Louisiana Task Force on Lead-Free Water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Louisiana Task Force on Lead-Free Water.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 51 CONCUR (#920) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 51 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#858) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 51 ADOPT (#194) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
2019-06-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-05SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-06-03SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays.
2019-05-30HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
2019-05-30HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-29HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-21HouseReported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2019-05-02HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2019-05-01SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
2019-04-30SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
2019-04-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SCR51&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127111
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128981
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142503
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128891
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129698
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140106
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141803
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127113
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130172
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143206
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129759
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141735
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142277

Bill Comments

feedback