LA SCR5 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses condolences upon the death of former legislator, community leader, and Shreveport businessman, Don Williamson.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses condolences upon the death of former legislator, community leader, and Shreveport businessman, Don Williamson.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 5 ADOPT (#13) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020.
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-03-16SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-03-11SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-03-11HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2020-03-11HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-03-10SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback