LA SCR5 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Bossier Parish Community College on its 50th anniversary.
Title
Commends Bossier Parish Community College on its 50th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 5 ADOPT (#6) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/7/2018. |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-02-19 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-02-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |