LA SCR48 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2018-2019 Fiscal Year. (EN +$3,045,000 SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2018-2019 Fiscal Year. (EN +$3,045,000 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SCR 48 RECORD VOTE (#1253) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 48 ADOPT (#646) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 48 ADOPT (#646) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 90 yeas, 0 nays. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |