LA SCR45 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 26 @ 9:30 am in Room 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a commission to study the feasibility of a constitutional convention and make recommendations relative thereto. (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a commission to study the feasibility of a constitutional convention and make recommendations relative thereto. (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 45 ADOPT (#241) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-03HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2018-04-03SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2018-03-27SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-26SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback