LA SCR43 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences upon the death of Mr. Johnnie Jones Sr.
Title
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences upon the death of Mr. Johnnie Jones Sr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 43 CO-AUTHORS (#391) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 43 ADOPT (#390) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 43 ADOPT (#390) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2022. |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-04-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |