LA SCR40 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/11/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/11/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elects Alan M. Boxberger as legislative fiscal officer.
Title
Elects Alan M. Boxberger as legislative fiscal officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on SCR 40 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#217) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 40 ADOPT (#183) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 40 ADOPT (#183) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/11/2023. |
2023-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2023-05-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in by vote of 90 yeas, 0 nays. |
2023-05-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |