LA SCR38 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-15)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received from the House without amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes May 11, 2019, as Louisiana Firefighters' Appreciation Day and commends all firefighters across the state for their dedication to public safety and for their service to the citizens of Louisiana and the United States of America.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes May 11, 2019, as Louisiana Firefighters' Appreciation Day and commends all firefighters across the state for their dedication to public safety and for their service to the citizens of Louisiana and the United States of America.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 38 ADOPT (#65) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2019-04-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback