LA SCR38 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a legislative task force to study sexual harassment issues regarding legislators, lobbyists, and other persons interacting with the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a legislative task force to study sexual harassment issues regarding legislators, lobbyists, and other persons interacting with the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on SCR 38 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#983) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 38 ADOPT (#276) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-11HouseRead by title, concurred in by vote of 84 yeas, 0 nays.
2018-05-11HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-11HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-26HouseReported favorably (6-0).
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-05HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2018-04-05SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2018-04-04SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2018-03-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback