LA SCR38 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-13)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-13)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the Louisiana Legislature's condolences on the death of former state Senator Erle Edwards Barham.
Title
Extends the Louisiana Legislature's condolences on the death of former state Senator Erle Edwards Barham.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 38 ADOPT (#49) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-04-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |