LA SCR33 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Mia Manzanares on being named the All-Around Cowgirl at the 2012 National High School Rodeo Association and the 2012 International Finals Youth Rodeo.
Title
Commends Mia Manzanares on being named the All-Around Cowgirl at the 2012 National High School Rodeo Association and the 2012 International Finals Youth Rodeo.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 33 ADOPT (#114) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-04-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-03-26 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-03-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |