LA SCR33 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the division of administration to publicly disclose the savings to be achieved by outsourcing services currently performed by state employees and the benefits that the contractor will be providing its employees prior to entering any contract outsourcing such services. (OR NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Directs the division of administration to publicly disclose the savings to be achieved by outsourcing services currently performed by state employees and the benefits that the contractor will be providing its employees prior to entering any contract outsourcing such services. (OR NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 33, ADOPT (#367) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-04-27 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-04-27 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2010-04-26 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-07 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |