LA SCR32 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Commends the service and contributions of first responders in Louisiana and designates April 30, 2019, as First Responders Appreciation Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends the service and contributions of first responders in Louisiana and designates April 30, 2019, as First Responders Appreciation Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 ADOPT (#99) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 CO-AUTHORS (#98) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2019-04-23HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2019-04-23SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-04-15SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback