LA SCR30 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits annual total cash general obligation capital outlay projects to general obligation bond cash line of credit capacity.
Title
Limits annual total cash general obligation capital outlay projects to general obligation bond cash line of credit capacity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |