LA SCR30 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 6-11, 2019, as National Economic Development Week.
Title
Recognizes May 6-11, 2019, as National Economic Development Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 30 ADOPT (#181) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-01 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |