LA SCR29 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/21/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/21/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Jonathan "Jon" Batiste on his many accomplishments.
Title
Commends Jonathan "Jon" Batiste on his many accomplishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 29 CO-AUTHORS (#218) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 29 ADOPT (#217) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 29 ADOPT (#217) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/21/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-04-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-04-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |