LA SCR26 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes Thursday, April 25, 2019, as Junior League Day at the state capitol and commends the Junior League for its contributions to the state of Louisiana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizes Thursday, April 25, 2019, as Junior League Day at the state capitol and commends the Junior League for its contributions to the state of Louisiana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 26 SCR 26 BY PEACOCK (#27) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-04-16SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-04-15SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-04-15HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2019-04-10HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2019-04-10SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2019-04-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback