LA SCR24 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Environmental Quality to study the feasibility of providing funding for devices that remediate certain water quality impairments.
Title
Requests the Department of Environmental Quality to study the feasibility of providing funding for devices that remediate certain water quality impairments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House Vote on SCR 24 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#676) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 24 ADOPT (#142) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 24 ADOPT (#142) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. |
2021-05-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2021. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-04-28 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-04-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |