LA SCR22 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requests BESE to suspend statewide standardized assessments for the 2019-2020 school year due to COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests BESE to suspend statewide standardized assessments for the 2019-2020 school year due to COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22 ADOPT (#218) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-05-15SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2020-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2020-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-03-16SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback