LA SCR18 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the state Department of Education to study the feasibility of banning the use of corporal punishment in public schools.
Title
Requests the state Department of Education to study the feasibility of banning the use of corporal punishment in public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House Vote on SCR 18 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#670) (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 18 ADOPT (#230) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 18 ADOPT (#230) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 60 yeas, 35 nays. |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2021-05-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |