LA SCR17 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the comprehensive master plan for integrated coastal protection.
Title
Approves the comprehensive master plan for integrated coastal protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House Vote on SCR 17 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#666) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17 CO-AUTHORS (#188) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17 ADOPT (#187) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17 CO-AUTHORS (#188) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17 ADOPT (#187) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2023-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2023-05-25 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays. |
2023-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023. |
2023-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-22 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2023-05-18 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-05-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2023-05-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2023-05-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |