LA SCR17 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the LSU Tiger Girls for winning the Division 1A Hip Hop competition at the 2022 Universal Dance Association College Nationals.
Title
Commends the LSU Tiger Girls for winning the Division 1A Hip Hop competition at the 2022 Universal Dance Association College Nationals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17 ADOPT (#333) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |