LA SCR17 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requests DOTD to seek state and federal funds to construct noise barriers on I-10 between Downman Road and Bullard Road in Orleans Parish.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests DOTD to seek state and federal funds to construct noise barriers on I-10 between Downman Road and Bullard Road in Orleans Parish.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17 ADOPT (#80) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2019-04-22HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2019-04-22SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2019-04-17SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback