LA SCR17 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests DOTD to seek state and federal funds to construct noise barriers on I-10 between Downman Road and Bullard Road in Orleans Parish.
Title
Requests DOTD to seek state and federal funds to construct noise barriers on I-10 between Downman Road and Bullard Road in Orleans Parish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17 ADOPT (#80) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-04-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |