LA SCR16 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/7/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/7/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences to the family of former Shreveport City Councilman James Flurry.
Title
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences to the family of former Shreveport City Councilman James Flurry.
Sponsors
Sen. Barry Milligan [R] | Sen. Barrow Peacock [R] | Sen. Gregory Tarver [D] | Sen. Samuel Jenkins [D] |
Sen. Thomas Pressly [R] | Sen. Alan Seabaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 16 ADOPT (#76) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/7/2022. |
2022-04-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-03-29 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-03-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |