LA SCR14 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the United States Department of Energy to carefully consider the benefits of liquid natural gas exports.
Title
Requests the United States Department of Energy to carefully consider the benefits of liquid natural gas exports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 14 ADOPT (#180) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |