LA SCR14 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Cybersecurity Redhibition Task Force.
Title
Establishes the Cybersecurity Redhibition Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 14 CONCUR (#1399) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 14 REJECT (#794) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on SCR 14 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1048) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 14 ADOPT (#164) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 14 REJECT (#794) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Vote on SCR 14 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1048) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 14 ADOPT (#164) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Discharged from Conference Committee. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate concurring in House amendments. |
2022-06-05 | House | Notice Senate discharged from Conference Committee. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | The vote by which the amendment(s) were rejected was reconsidered. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee members discharged. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-31 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Foil, Milligan, and Smith. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-05-26 | House | House conferees appointed: Stagni, Stefanski, and Deshotel. |
2022-05-24 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. |
2022-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |