LA SCR136 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of James Donald "Don" Lincoln and posthumously commends him on his contributions to Louisiana cinema, culture, and the arts.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of James Donald "Don" Lincoln and posthumously commends him on his contributions to Louisiana cinema, culture, and the arts.
Sponsors
Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D] | Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Rep. Patricia Smith [D] |
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 136 ADOPT (#863) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-06-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |