LA SCR12 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the passing of Byron Terrell Dore and support for the dedication of a flagpole installed in his honor at the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries Law Enforcement Training and Emergency Response Complex.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the passing of Byron Terrell Dore and support for the dedication of a flagpole installed in his honor at the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries Law Enforcement Training and Emergency Response Complex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 12 ADOPT (#9) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-24 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-05-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |