LA SCR12 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends Dave Norris on being named to the Louisiana Political Hall of Fame.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends Dave Norris on being named to the Louisiana Political Hall of Fame.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 12 ADOPT (#37) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
2017-02-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-02-20SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-02-19SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2017-02-19HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2017-02-19HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2017-02-18SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback