LA SCR117 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates September 2019 as Childhood Cancer Awareness Month in Louisiana.
Title
Designates September 2019 as Childhood Cancer Awareness Month in Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 117 ADOPT (#445) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-05-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |