LA SCR113 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Public Works Contracts Task Force to study the feasibility of increasing the contract limit applicable to public works contracts.
Title
Creates the Public Works Contracts Task Force to study the feasibility of increasing the contract limit applicable to public works contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on SCR 113 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#970) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 113 ADOPT (#614) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 113 ADOPT (#614) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |