LA SCR111 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Doyle High School girls softball team upon winning the 2018 LHSAA Class 2A championship.
Title
Commends the Doyle High School girls softball team upon winning the 2018 LHSAA Class 2A championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Erdey [R] | Sen. Eddie Lambert [R] | Sen. Mack White [R] | Sen. Valarie Hodges [R] |
Rep. Sherman Mack [R] | Sen. Rogers Pope [R] | Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 111 ADOPT (#896) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |