LA SCR106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the LaSalle High School softball and baseball teams for winning the LHSAA Class 1A state championships.
Title
Commends the LaSalle High School softball and baseball teams for winning the LHSAA Class 1A state championships.
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] | Rep. Terry Brown [I] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 106 SCR 106 BY RISER (#399) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-05-24 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-05-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |