LA SCR102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana State Licensing Board for Contractors to study the criteria used to assess penalties against contractors who violate licensing laws.
Title
Requests the Louisiana State Licensing Board for Contractors to study the criteria used to assess penalties against contractors who violate licensing laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 102 ADOPT (#462) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-05-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |