LA SCR102 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Affirms the need for civility in political discourse and debate as a fundamental requirement for effective representative democracy and governing.
Title
Affirms the need for civility in political discourse and debate as a fundamental requirement for effective representative democracy and governing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on SCR 102 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#832) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 102 ADOPT (#508) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 102 CO-AUTHORS (#507) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 102 ADOPT (#508) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 102 CO-AUTHORS (#507) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |