LA SCR10 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-14 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-14 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Ronnie Jones for his dedication, knowledge, experience, and leadership as chairman of the Louisiana Gaming Control Board.
Title
Commends Ronnie Jones for his dedication, knowledge, experience, and leadership as chairman of the Louisiana Gaming Control Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 CO-AUTHORS (#13) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#12) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#12) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2020. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-06-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2020-06-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |