LA SB95 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective date 6/4/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the return of certain schools in the Recovery School District to the transferring school board. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the return of certain schools in the Recovery School District to the transferring school board. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 95 FINAL PASSAGE (#749) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 95 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 95 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 6/4/2021. |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 93. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-05-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |