LA SB92 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to notarial examinations by secretary of state. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to notarial examinations by secretary of state. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on SB 92 FINAL PASSAGE (#734) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 92 FINAL PASSAGE (#34) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateEffective date 5/15/2018.
2018-05-15SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 145.
2018-05-09SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-08SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-07SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18.
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-17HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-16HouseReported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-03-19HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2018-03-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-15SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-14SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-13SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2018-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB92&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067186
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074436
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093759
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097956
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067187
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074217
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075178
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075592
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098731
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096163
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075344
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093159

Bill Comments

feedback