LA SB88 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain deposits insured or guaranteed by a governmental agency insuring bank deposits that is organized under federal law from security requirements. (8/15/10) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Exempts certain deposits insured or guaranteed by a governmental agency insuring bank deposits that is organized under federal law from security requirements. (8/15/10) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 88, FINAL PASSAGE (#1572) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 88, FINAL PASSAGE (#225) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 88, FINAL PASSAGE (#225) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-07-06 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 957. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-09 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-08 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-04-19 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-19 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-14 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |