LA SB87 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires a nonresident producer to surrender the Louisiana nonresident license when the resident license on which it is based terminates. (1/1/2020)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a nonresident producer to surrender the Louisiana nonresident license when the resident license on which it is based terminates. (1/1/2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 87 FINAL PASSAGE (#103) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-23SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback