LA SB85 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the state Department of Education and the Louisiana Department of Health to survey students regarding certain risk behavior associated with chronic health conditions. (gov sig)
Title
Authorizes the state Department of Education and the Louisiana Department of Health to survey students regarding certain risk behavior associated with chronic health conditions. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 85 FINAL PASSAGE (#321) (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 22 nays. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |