LA SB82 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an additional state employee position in the office of the registrar in St. Landry Parish. (8/15/10) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Establishes an additional state employee position in the office of the registrar in St. Landry Parish. (8/15/10) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 82, FINAL PASSAGE (#1681) (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 82, FINAL PASSAGE (#865) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 82, FINAL PASSAGE (#865) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 765. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 9. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-06-02 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-06-01 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-27 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-26 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |