LA SB81 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to requirement for certain student demographic information to be included from the Taylor Opportunity Program for Students Information System. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to requirement for certain student demographic information to be included from the Taylor Opportunity Program for Students Information System. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 81 FINAL PASSAGE (#1491) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 81 FINAL PASSAGE (#432) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 81 FINAL PASSAGE (#432) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/18/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 665. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-19 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (6-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |