LA SB81 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the boards of supervisors for the Louisiana State University, Southern University, University of Louisiana and Louisiana Community and Technical College systems to broadcast the live audio and video of all board and committee meetings conducted in Baton Rouge over the Internet. (1/1/15) (EG +$198,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the boards of supervisors for the Louisiana State University, Southern University, University of Louisiana and Louisiana Community and Technical College systems to broadcast the live audio and video of all board and committee meetings conducted in Baton Rouge over the Internet. (1/1/15) (EG +$198,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |