LA SB80 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 27 @ 11:30 am in Room 5
Hearing: May 27 @ 8:30 am in Room 1
Hearing: May 27 @ 9:00 am in Room 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts interior blueprints and floor plans of public school buildings and facilities from the definition of "public records". (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts interior blueprints and floor plans of public school buildings and facilities from the definition of "public records". (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 80 FINAL PASSAGE (#239) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-05-18SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-14SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-21SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback