LA SB78 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides the information to be submitted to the legislative fiscal information for the review of instruments relative to tax exemptions, exclusions, deductions, and credits. (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides the information to be submitted to the legislative fiscal information for the review of instruments relative to tax exemptions, exclusions, deductions, and credits. (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-27SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2015-05-26SenateRead by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-25SenateReported with amendments.
2015-05-19SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2015-05-18SenateReported with amendments.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2015-03-31SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=SB78&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=933175
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948964
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951375
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=948852
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951171
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951221
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952191
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=933178
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=939304
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=949622
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950332
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952048
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952240

Bill Comments

feedback