LA SB77 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date 10/28/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date 10/28/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to fantasy sports. (gov sig) (Item #32) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to fantasy sports. (gov sig) (Item #32) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Vote on SB 77 FINAL PASSAGE (#207) (Y: 72 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 77 FINAL PASSAGE (#103) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 77 FINAL PASSAGE (#103) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | Senate | Effective date 10/28/2020. |
2020-10-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 44. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-10-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-10-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 15. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/21/20. |
2020-10-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-20 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-20 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |