LA SB746 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Effective date 1/1/13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Effective date 1/1/13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the manner of converting the state of organization of domestic and foreign limited liability companies. (1/1/13)
Title
Provides relative to the manner of converting the state of organization of domestic and foreign limited liability companies. (1/1/13)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 746, FINAL PASSAGE (#943) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 746, FINAL PASSAGE (#337) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 746, FINAL PASSAGE (#337) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Effective date 1/1/13. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 476. | |
2012-05-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-21 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-21 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2012. | |
2012-05-09 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2012-05-08 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-07 | Reported favorably (11-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-11 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2012-04-10 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-10 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-09 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-04 | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 547. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |